SB0126

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, and 2012

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation


Synopsis:Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $1,103,006,000, the proceeds to be used for specified necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring specified real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to specified subdivisions and other organizations for specified development and improvement purposes; etc.
Analysis:Not available at this time
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0101
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, June 1, 2014, June 1, 2015, June 1, 2016, June 1, 2017, June 1, 2018, June 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Capital Budget
Narrow Subject(s):Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Capital Budgets
State Bonds
Statutes:Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 29, 2013 9:54 P.M.