SB0128 (CH0181)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale for Class B Licensees

Sponsored by:

Senator Glassman

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181


Synopsis:Altering the hours of sale for a Class B Cafe licensee in Harford County.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Glassman, Jacobs, and Jennings
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0343
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee HearingEconomic Matters
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Harford County
Restaurants
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(11-513)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/16/20131/16/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
2/11/20132/11/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/20132/12/2013Favorable Report Adopted23
Second Reading Passed23
2/14/20132/14/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)25
House2/15/20132/15/2013First Reading Economic Matters28
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)66
Senate4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.