SB0139

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Higher Education - Heroin and Opioid Addiction and Prevention Policies - Exceptions and Revisions

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

In the House - First Reading Appropriations


Synopsis:Exempting the University of Maryland, University College, the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science, and an off-campus nonresidential location of an institution of higher education from the requirement to establish a policy that addresses heroin and opioid addiction and prevention that includes storing naloxone and training campus police or other designated personnel on how to recognize the symptoms of an opioid overdose; requiring these institutions to provide all students with certain resources; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Conway and Miller
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingAppropriations
Broad Subject(s):Higher Education
Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Drugs; Subst Abus
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Exemptions
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Job Training -see also- Continuing Education
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
State Universities and Colleges
Storage
Substance Abuse
Statutes:Article - Education
(11-1201, 11-1202, 11-1203)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 13, 2018 10:19 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/12/20181/12/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/20181/17/2018Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2/5/20182/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/20182/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {884535/1 Report Adopted20
Second Reading Passed with Amendments20
2/8/20182/8/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)22
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Appropriations23

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 9, 2018 11:12 A.M.