SB0155

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - Requirements

Sponsored by:

Senator Reilly

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Synopsis:Prohibiting an employee of a public body from creating or maintaining government e-mail by using a personal e-mail account; requiring an employee of a public body, under specified circumstances, to forward government e-mail to the official e-mail account of the employee within 5 days after the government e-mail is received; requiring each public body to retain government e-mail for a minimum of 7 years or, under specified circumstances, permanently; requiring the State Archivist to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Reilly
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0492
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Archives
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Electronic Government
Ethics
Public Information
Public Officials -see also- Atty Gen; Compt; Coun Admin; etc
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Statutes:Article - General Provisions
(4.5-101 through 4.5-103)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/15/20161/15/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/20161/20/2016Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2/1/20162/1/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
2/9/20162/9/2016Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.