SB0160

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption

Sponsored by:

Senator Frosh

Status:

In the House - Special Order until later today (Delegate Barve) Adopted


Synopsis:Establishing that, in an action against an owner of a dog for damages for personal injury or death caused by the dog, evidence that the dog caused the injury or death creates a rebuttable presumption that the owner knew or should have known that the dog had vicious or dangerous propensities; providing that the presumption may not be rebutted as a matter of law; providing that the presumption may be rebutted by specified clear and convincing evidence; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Frosh, Brochin, Gladden, Raskin, Stone, and Manno
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0078
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Civil Actions and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Animals -see also- Birds; Turtles
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Condominiums
Corporations -see also- Municipal Corps; Public Corps & Inst
Court of Appeals
Damages
Death -see also- Advance Medical Directives; Wrongful Death
Emergency Bills
Evidence
Homeowners Associations
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condos; Mobile & Manuf Homes
Landlord and Tenant -see also- Eviction; Leases & Rent; etc.
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Real Property
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(3-1901)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/17/20131/17/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/18/20131/18/2013Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable with Amendments {798879/143
Special Order until later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 43
Favorable with Amendments {798879/1 Report Adopted43
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {333623/1 Rejected (6-40)43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/14/20133/14/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)45
House3/14/20133/14/2013First Reading Judiciary47
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/28/20133/24/2013Favorable with Amendments {922917/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
4/1/20133/26/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0)59
Senate4/3/20133/29/2013Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments60
Senate Requests House Recede60
Conference Committee Appointed60
Senators Raskin, Zirkin, and Shank60
House4/4/20133/29/2013House Refuses to Recede62
Conference Committee Appointed62
Delegates Dumais, Clippinger, and Cluster62
Senate4/8/20134/3/2013Conference Committee Report Adopted65
Third Reading Passed (47-0)65
House4/8/20134/4/2013Conference Committee Report Adopted68
Special Order until later today (Delegate Barve) Adopted 68

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.