SB0161 (CH0278)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Alcoholic Beverages - Hard Cider - Definition

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278


Synopsis:Altering the definition of hard cider to include beverages derived primarily from pears or pear concentrate and water, containing no other fruit product, and containing at least one-half of 1% and less than 7% of alcohol by volume.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Conway and Reilly
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0261
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs   View Committee HearingEconomic Matters
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages -see also- AB-By Subd; Subst Abuse; etc.
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:55 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/13/20141/13/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/20141/29/2014Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20143/4/2014Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/20143/5/2014Favorable Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed39
3/7/20143/7/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)41
House3/7/20143/7/2014First Reading Economic Matters43
3/27/20143/27/2014Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/27/20143/22/2014Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
3/28/20143/23/2014Third Reading Passed (131-0)59
Senate3/31/20143/22/2014Returned Passed56
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:55 P.M.