SB0168 (CH0196)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and Limits

Sponsored by:

Senator Simonaire

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196


Synopsis:Authorizing a guardian of the property of a minor or disabled person to petition the court to deposit cash belonging to the minor or disabled person in an amount not exceeding $200,000 into a single restricted account; requiring specified excess amounts to be deposited into additional restricted accounts not exceeding $200,000; and authorizing a deposit under the Act to be made into any type of account, including a certificate of deposit, in a specified financial institution or one that accepts deposits and is federally insured.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Simonaire
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0008
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Estates and Trusts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Narrow Subject(s):Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Estates and Trusts
Guardians
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Orphans' Court
Petitions
Statutes:Article - Estates and Trusts
(13-209.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/17/20131/17/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/18/20131/18/2013Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2/11/20132/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/12/20132/12/2013Favorable with Amendments {668879/1 Report Adopted23
Second Reading Passed with Amendments23
2/14/20132/14/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)25
House2/15/20132/15/2013First Reading Judiciary28
2/26/20132/26/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/28/20133/24/2013Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/1/20133/26/2013Third Reading Passed (133-0)59
Senate4/1/20133/27/2013Returned Passed58
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.