SB0173 (CH0534)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Local Government - Clean Energy Loan Programs - Commercial Property Owners - Renewable Energy Projects

Sponsored by:

Senator Feldman

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534


Synopsis:Removing the limitation that renewable energy projects by commercial property owners financed through a clean energy loan program have an electric generating capacity of not more than 100 kilowatts.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Feldman, Middleton, Klausmeier, Mathias, and Pugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0105
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingEconomic Matters
Broad Subject(s):Local Government - Generally
Narrow Subject(s):Alternative Energy Sources
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Energy Matters -see also- Alt Energy Sou; Fuel; Power Plants
Loans -see also- Mortgages
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Statutes:Article - Local Government
(1-1101, 1-1102, 1-1103)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/18/20161/18/2016First Reading Finance
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2/1/20162/1/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2/2/20162/2/2016Favorable with Amendments {807075/1 Report Adopted15
Second Reading Passed with Amendments15
2/4/20162/4/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)17
House2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Economic Matters18
3/29/20163/29/2016Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/29/20163/24/2016Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
3/30/20163/25/2016Third Reading Passed (98-37)57
Senate3/31/20163/27/2016Returned Passed56
Post Passage5/19/20165/19/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.