SB0187 (CH0010)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10


Synopsis:Authorizing or altering the distribution of certain revenue; altering or repealing certain required appropriations; requiring that any increase in judicial salary be included in the portion of the budget bill relating to the judiciary department; establishing the Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education Fund to assist in providing a world-class education to Maryland students; requiring the Commission to make recommendations regarding inflationary indices to be used in certain formulas; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0161
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingAppropriations
Broad Subject(s):Operating Budget
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Agriculture -see also- Farmland
Appropriations
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs -see also- Musms; Theat; etc
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Baltimore City
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Community Colleges
Community Development
Community Facilities and Services
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Consumer Price Index
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Environment, Department of
Grants
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Health, Department of
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Historical Matters
Hospitals -see also- Clinics; State Hospitals
Income Tax
Insurance Administration
Interest
Local Government Mandates
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Notices
Pollution -see also- Sediment Control
Prince George's County
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Retirement Systems -see also- Mandatory Retirement
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Spouses
State Universities and Colleges
Support of Dependents -see also- Alimony
Tax Returns
Teachers
Time
Treasurers
Women -see also- Gender
Statutes:Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2011, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2017)
Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(1-704)
Article - Education
(18-19A-04.1, 18-303.1, 6-117.1, 6-306, 5-219)
Article - Health - General
(2-302)
Article - Housing and Community Development
(4-508, 4-509, 6-510)
Article - Natural Resources
(5-903)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(3-207, 6-104, 6-226, 7-310, 7-311, 7-324)
Article - State Personnel and Pensions
(2-509.1)
Article - Tax - General
(2-202, 2-606)
Article - Tax - Property
(13-209)
Article - Transportation
(12-118, 2-103.1, 4-210)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 23, 2018 11:34 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/17/20181/17/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments {399834/144
Motion to Suspend Rule 52 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted44
Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted44
3/13/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {399834/145
Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 45
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments {399834/146
Committee Amendment (#1-4) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#5-13) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#14-20) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#21-25) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#26-30) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#31-37) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#38-43) Adopted46
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted46
Floor Amendment {133923/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/15/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)47
House3/15/20183/12/2018First Reading Appropriations46
3/19/20183/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/19/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments {694263/149
Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 49
3/21/20183/17/2018Favorable with Amendments51
Favorable with Amendments {694263/151
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted51
Committee Amendment (#2) Adopted51
Committee Amendment (#3-4) Adopted51
Committee Amendment (#5) Adopted51
Committee Amendment (#6) Adopted51
Committee Amendment (#7) Adopted (84-50)51
Committee Amendment (#8-14) Adopted51
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted51
Floor Amendment {373625/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-86)51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/22/20183/18/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (94-42)52
Senate3/23/20183/21/2018Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments52
Senate Requests House Recede52
Conference Committee Appointed52
Senators Kasemeyer, DeGrange, Madaleno, King, and Edwards52
Senate advisors:52
(Senators McFadden, Ferguson and Serafini)52
House3/23/20183/18/2018House Refuses to Recede52A
Conference Committee Appointed52A
Delegates McIntosh, Gaines, Jones, Reznik, and Beitzel52A
House advisors:52A
(Delegates Haynes and Kaiser)52A
Senate3/27/20183/23/2018Conference Committee Report Adopted54
Third Reading Passed (47-0)54
House3/27/20183/20/2018Conference Committee Report Adopted54A
Third Reading Passed (100-38)54A
Senate3/27/20183/23/2018Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/5/20184/5/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2018 10:56 A.M.