SB0199 (CH0205)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior Liens

Sponsored by:

Senator Frosh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205


Synopsis:Authorizing a mortgagor or grantor to refinance the indebtedness secured by a first mortgage or deed of trust at a lower interest rate without obtaining permission from the holder of a junior lien under specified circumstances; providing that a refinance mortgage meeting the requirements of the Act shall have, on recordation, the same lien priority as the mortgage or deed of trust it replaces; requiring a specified statement to be included on a refinance mortgage; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Frosh and Klausmeier
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0088
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingEnvironmental Matters  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Real Property
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Narrow Subject(s):Agents and Brokers
Deeds
Liens -see also- Mechanics' Liens
Mortgages
Notices
Real Property
Recordation
Statutes:Article - Real Property
(3-203, 7-112)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/6/20133/6/2013Favorable with Amendments {638972/1 Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed with Amendments39
3/8/20133/8/2013Third Reading Passed (45-0)41
House3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Environmental Matters43
3/25/20133/25/2013Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20134/6/2013Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
4/6/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (136-0)66
Senate4/8/20134/4/2013Returned Passed66
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.