SB0220

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Veto sustained (0-46)


Synopsis:Repealing provisions of law that require State agencies to submit reports to the General Assembly that are deemed obsolete, duplicative, impractical, inefficient, or otherwise unnecessary; combining specified reporting requirements with other more extensive annual reports required to be submitted by State agencies; requiring the Department of Legislative Services, in consultation with agencies of the State government, to periodically review and make recommendations regarding specified reports that may no longer be warranted; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:The President
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0067
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Committee(s):
RulesHealth and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - General Assembly
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Administrative Hearings, Office of
AELR Committee
Aging, Department of
Agriculture, Department of
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Attorney General
Baltimore City
Budget and Management, Department of
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Comptroller
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Education, State Board of
Environment, Department of
Estates and Trusts
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Highway Administration, State
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Resources, Department of
Insurance Administration
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Legislation -see also- Correct Leg; Cur Leg; Emerg Bills
Legislative Services, Department of
Natural Resources, Department of
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Transportation, Department of
Statutes:Article - Agriculture
(2-901, 5-704)
Article - Criminal Procedure
(11-1006)
Article - Criminal Law
(5-1002)
Article - Economic Development
(10-713, 14-102, 2-123, 3-404, 4-216, 5-315, 5-419, 5-512, 5-555, 6-307, 6-529)
Article - Education
(16-106)
Article - Environment
(2-1107, 9-351)
Article - Family Law
(5-1309)
Article - State Personnel and Pensions
(21-104, 21-108, 21-123, 21-125.1, 21-128)
Article - Health - General
(10-207, 13-1002, 13-1004, 13-1013, 13-1102, 13-1104, 13-2105, 13-21A-02, 13-2504, 15-102.4, 15-124.2, 19-310.1)
Article - Housing and Community Development
(4-215)
Article - Human Services
(10-208, 10-306, 6-708)
Article - Insurance
(11-326, 14-102)
Article - Labor and Employment
(10-219, 10-320, 5-608, 8-422, 9-312)
Article - Natural Resources
(1-104, 1-706, 3-3A-04, 4-210, 4-210.1, 4-2A-04, 4-746, 5-103, 5-1613, 5-307, 8-1808.1, 8-2103)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(14-505, 17-204, 5-7B-09, 5A-403, 7-314, 7-317)
Article - State Government
(2-10A-03, 2-10A-07, 2-10A-13, 2-506, 9-1405, 2-1209)
Article - Tax - General
(10-721, 10-725, 10-730, 10-732, 10-733)
Article - Tax - Property
(9-102)
Article - Transportation
(23-203, 6-201.2, 6-210, 8-309, 8-613)
Article - Chapter of the Acts
(1983, 1984, 1987, 1991, 1994, 1995, 1996, 1997, 1999, 2001, 2002, 2003, 2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2011, 2013)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:47 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/2/20152/2/2015First Reading Senate Rules
2/4/20152/4/2015Hearing 2/10 at 11:00 a.m.
2/10/20152/10/2015Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
2/16/20152/16/2015Hearing 2/17 at 11:00 a.m.
2/18/20152/18/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Senate Rules
2/19/20152/19/2015Favorable with Amendments {333121/126
Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted26
2/20/20152/20/2015Favorable with Amendments {333121/127
Committee Amendment Adopted27
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted27
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {683826/127
Special Order until 2/23 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 27
2/23/20152/23/2015Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {683826/1 Withdrawn28
Second Reading Passed with Amendments28
2/25/20152/25/2015Third Reading Passed (47-0)30
House2/26/20152/26/2015First Reading Health and Government Operations32
3/18/20153/18/2015Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20153/31/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/1/20153/28/2015Favorable with Amendments {356889/1 Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/2/20153/29/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)59
Senate4/3/20153/29/2015Senate Concur - House Amendments56
Third Reading Passed (45-0)56
Passed Enrolled56
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/13/20161/13/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
1/21/20161/21/2016Veto sustained (0-46)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:47 P.M.