SB0234

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Land Records - Repeal

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Repealing a specified provision of law concerning the preparation of specified documents submitted for inclusion in the land records of St. Mary's County.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Waugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0404
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingEnvironment and Transportation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Counties - Local Laws
Narrow Subject(s):Attorneys
Clerks of Court
Land Records -see also- Deeds
Public Local Laws
St. Mary's County
Statutes:Article - St. Mary's County
(73-1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 21, 2017 4:53 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2/6/20172/6/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/20172/7/2017Favorable Report Adopted18
Second Reading Passed18
2/9/20172/9/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)20
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation23
3/6/20173/6/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/3/20173/27/2017Favorable Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed61A
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)68
Senate4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 30, 2017 1:01 P.M.