SB0238 (CH0212)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212


Synopsis:Continuing the State Board of Public Accountancy in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2025, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; requiring that an evaluation of the Board and the statutes and regulations that relate to the Board be performed on or before July 1, 2024; and requiring the Board to submit a specified report on or before October 1, 2013.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0209
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee HearingEconomic Matters
Broad Subject(s):Business Regulation and Occupations
State Government - General Assembly
Narrow Subject(s):Accountants
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Reports
Sunset
Statutes:Article - Business Occupations and Professions
(2-702)
Article - State Government
(8-403)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.