SB0239 (CH0034)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34


Synopsis:Increasing the number of judges of the Court of Special Appeals from 13 to 15; increasing the number of resident judges of the circuit court in Calvert, Carroll, Cecil, Frederick, and Wicomico counties; and increasing the number of associate judges of the District Court in Baltimore City, and Charles, Montgomery, and Prince George's counties.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Maryland Judiciary) and Senators Garagiola and Pipkin
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0083
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Narrow Subject(s):Baltimore City
Calvert County
Carroll County
Cecil County
Charles County
Circuit Courts
Court of Special Appeals
District Courts
Frederick County
Judges
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Wicomico County
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(1-402, 1-503, 1-603)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/21/20131/18/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed43
3/14/20133/14/2013Third Reading Passed (45-0)45
House3/14/20133/14/2013First Reading Judiciary47
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (132-5)63
Senate4/5/20133/31/2013Returned Passed62
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.