SB0245 (CH0318)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their Spouses

Sponsored by:

Senator Manno

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318


Synopsis:Authorizing employers to grant a preference in hiring and promotion to eligible veterans, spouses of eligible veterans who have service-connected disabilities, and surviving spouses of deceased eligible veterans; providing that granting a preference under the Act does not violate State or local equal employment opportunity laws; and defining the term "eligible veteran".
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Manno, Peters, Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Mathias, Pugh, and Reilly
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingEconomic Matters
Broad Subject(s):Private Sector Labor and Industry
Narrow Subject(s):Armed Forces -see also- Military Department; Veterans
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Health -see also- Mental Health
Surveyors
Veterans
Weather
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Labor and Employment
(3-714)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/22/20161/22/2016First Reading Finance
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2/8/20162/8/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2/9/20162/9/2016Favorable with Amendments {887577/1 Report Adopted19
Second Reading Passed with Amendments19
2/11/20162/11/2016Third Reading Passed (47-0)21
House2/12/20162/12/2016First Reading Economic Matters23
4/6/20164/6/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
4/6/20163/30/2016Favorable with Amendments {553597/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/7/20164/1/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-2)64
Senate4/9/20164/3/2016Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments63
Senate Requests House Recede63
Conference Committee Appointed63
Senators Astle, Klausmeier, and Reilly63
House4/9/20164/4/2016House Refuses to Recede67
Conference Committee Appointed67
Delegates C. Wilson, Brooks, and S. Howard67
Senate4/11/20164/7/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted67
Third Reading Passed (46-0)67
House4/11/20164/8/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted71
Third Reading Passed (138-1)71
Senate4/11/20164/7/2016Passed Enrolled71
Post Passage5/10/20165/10/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.