SB0256

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act

Sponsored by:

Senator Pinsky

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Requiring certain candidates for President or Vice President of the United States to file copies of certain federal tax returns and written consent for the disclosure of those tax returns with the State Board of Elections no later than 65 days before a presidential election; requiring the State Board to make these tax returns filed by a Presidential ticket publicly available on the State Board's website; prohibiting certain candidates who fail to satisfy the requirements of the Act from appearing on the general election ballot; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Pinsky, Benson, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0662
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0358 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Elections
Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Ballots
Disclosure
Elections -see also- Ballots; Camp Financ; Pol Cands; Voting
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government -see also- Electronic Communication
Federal Government
Income Tax
Notices
Political Candidates
Political Parties
Public Information
Time
Statutes:Article - Election Law
(8-503, 5-102)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 20, 2018 4:25 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/19/20181/19/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
2/26/20182/26/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/20182/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {504331/135
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted35
2/28/20182/28/2018Favorable with Amendments {504331/1 Report Adopted36
Floor Amendment {473328/1 (Senator Hough)36
Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted36
Floor Amendment {473328/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (20-25)36
Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted 36
3/1/20183/1/2018Floor Amendment {563423/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (20-24)37
Floor Amendment {493721/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (20-26)37
Floor Amendment {213029/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-29)37
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hough) Rejected (18-28)37
Second Reading Passed with Amendments37
3/5/20183/5/2018Third Reading Passed (28-17)39
House3/6/20183/6/2018First Reading Ways and Means40
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 7, 2018 1:53 P.M.