SB0261

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations

Sponsored by:

Senator Young

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Altering the effective date of specified regulations adopted under the Administrative Procedure Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Young, Garagiola, Kittleman, Montgomery, Benson, Dyson, Ferguson, Rosapepe, and Simonaire
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0016
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee HearingHealth and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Administrative Procedure Act
Environmental Health -see also- Pollution
Federal Government
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Maryland Register
Medical Assistance
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
Statutes:Article - State Government
(10-117)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/23/20131/23/2013Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs10
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable with Amendments {294630/1 Report Adopted42
Second Reading Passed with Amendments42
3/13/20133/13/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)44
House3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations46
3/20/20133/20/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.