SB0262 (CH0035)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35


Synopsis:Establishing the Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to specified public officials on or before October 1, 2014; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0129
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0280 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Narrow Subject(s):Attorneys
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Legal Aid
Reports
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed43
3/14/20133/14/2013Third Reading Passed (45-0)45
House3/14/20133/14/2013First Reading Judiciary47
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/28/20133/24/2013Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/1/20133/26/2013Third Reading Passed (99-33)59
Senate4/1/20133/27/2013Returned Passed58
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.