SB0265 (CH0037)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37


Synopsis:Expanding the proceedings for which a local department of social services is required to provide specified notice to preadoptive parents and foster parents of a child under specified circumstances and at which preadoptive parents and foster parents have the right to be heard; repealing a requirement that a local department of social services provide specified notice to specified relatives of a child and substituting a requirement that the local department provide specified notice to caregivers of a child; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0278
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Family Law
Narrow Subject(s):Adoption
Attorneys
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Foster Care
Guardians
Juvenile Causes
Notices
Social Services -see also- Welfare
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(3-816.2, 3-823)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/13/20133/13/2013Favorable Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed44
3/15/20133/15/2013Third Reading Passed (41-0)46
House3/18/20133/15/2013First Reading Judiciary48A
3/19/20133/19/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20133/29/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20133/27/2013Third Reading Passed (139-1)60
Senate4/3/20133/29/2013Returned Passed60
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.