SB0267 (CH0038)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid Fraud

Sponsored by:

Senator Raskin

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38


Synopsis:Adding abuse or neglect of a vulnerable adult and offenses relating to Medicaid fraud to those crimes for which specified evidence may be gathered by, and a judge may grant an order authorizing, interception of oral, wire, or electronic communications.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Raskin, Frosh, Madaleno, and Shank
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0116
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Communications -see also- Language; Telecommun & Info Tech
Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect
Elderly Persons
Electronic Surveillance -see also- Wiretapping
Evidence
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Investigations and Inquiries -see also- Crim Bckgrnd Invest
Judges
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Medical Assistance
Wiretapping
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(10-402, 10-406)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/6/20133/6/2013Favorable Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed39
3/8/20133/8/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)41
House3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Judiciary43
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20133/29/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20133/27/2013Third Reading Passed (140-0)60
Senate4/3/20133/29/2013Returned Passed60
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.