SB0290

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force to Study the Applicability of the Maryland Prevailing Wage Law

Sponsored by:

Senator Stone

Status:

In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments


Synopsis:Establishing a Task Force to Study the Applicability of the Maryland Prevailing Wage Law; providing for the membership and cochairs of the Task Force; requiring the Department of Legislative Services, with assistance from the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, to staff the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to examine the current Prevailing Wage Law and how it applies to school construction projects; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations on or before December 31, 2013; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Stone and Manno
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1098
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0368 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Finance  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Procurement
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Construction
Contractors -see also- Heating & Cooling; Home Improvement
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Legislative Services, Department of
Local Government Mandates
Procurement
Public Works
Reports
Salaries -see also- Overtime; Reimbursement Rates
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Finance
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20134/8/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/8/20134/6/2013Favorable with Amendments {647275/1 Report Adopted68
Second Reading Passed with Amendments68

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.