SB0297 (CH0120)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local Provisions

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120


Synopsis:Repealing provisions of law that relate to exemptions for specified persons engaged in the business of manufacturing in St. Mary's County from specified taxes under specified circumstances.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Waugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0431
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Narrow Subject(s):Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Exemptions
Industry and Technology
St. Mary's County
Statutes:Article - St. Mary's County
(131-1, 131-2)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2017 4:38 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation
1/25/20171/25/2017Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20172/20/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2/21/20172/21/2017Favorable Report Adopted28
Second Reading Passed28
2/23/20172/23/2017Third Reading Passed (45-0)30
House2/24/20172/24/2017First Reading Ways and Means33
3/1/20173/1/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30/20173/30/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/30/20173/26/2017Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
3/31/20173/27/2017Third Reading Passed (136-0)61
Senate4/3/20173/28/2017Returned Passed57
Post Passage4/11/20174/11/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.