SB0297 (CH0053)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53


Synopsis:Continuing the State Board of Individual Tax Preparers in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2026, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; requiring that an evaluation of the Board and the statutes and regulations that relate to the Board be performed on or before December 15, 2023; and requiring the Board to submit a specified report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2015.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0254
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs   View Committee HearingEconomic Matters
Broad Subject(s):Business Regulation and Occupations
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Legislative Services, Department of
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Reports
Sunset
Tax Preparers
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:55 P.M.