SB0298 (CH0428)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - Salaries

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428


Synopsis:Altering the salary of the Sheriff of St. Mary's County, the County Treasurer of St. Mary's County, and the State's Attorney for St. Mary's County; and providing for the application of the Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Waugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0682
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee HearingEnvironment and Transportation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Counties - Local Laws
Narrow Subject(s):Public Officials -see also- Atty Gen; Compt; Coun Admin; etc
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Sheriffs
St. Mary's County
Treasurers
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(2-309)
Article - Criminal Procedure
(15-419)
Article - Local Government
(16-203)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2017 11:01 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/25/20171/25/2017Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20172/20/2017Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/21/20172/21/2017Favorable Report Adopted28
Second Reading Passed28
2/23/20172/23/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)30
House2/24/20172/24/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation33
3/28/20173/28/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
4/7/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {340414/1 Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)66
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments63A
Third Reading Passed (35-0)63A
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.