SB0304 (CH0379)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Taxpayer Protection Act

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from employing an individual not registered with the State Board of Individual Tax Preparers to provide specified tax preparation services; providing specified employees of the Field Enforcement Bureau of the Comptroller's Office with specified police powers when enforcing specified laws; authorizing the Attorney General to bring a specified civil action to enjoin a person from acting as an income tax preparer under specified circumstances; imposing a penalty on specified income tax preparers for specified offenses; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0424
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Taxes - Sales and Use
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Attorney General
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Comptroller
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Income Tax
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Sales and Use Tax
Tax Preparers
Statutes:Article - Business Occupations and Professions
(21-401)
Article - Tax - General
(10-911, 13-1004, 13-201, 13-203, 13-703, 13-715, 2-107, 13-706.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 10, 2017 9:02 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments {299335/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/17/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)46
House3/17/20173/14/2017First Reading Judiciary48
3/18/20173/18/2017Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/7/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {592112/1 Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/10/20174/4/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0)69
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments63A
Third Reading Passed (46-0)63A
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.