SB0307 (CH0030)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act - Application and Evaluation

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30


Synopsis:Altering the definition of "major transportation project"; requiring the Department to develop a model that uses a specified project-based scoring system to rank specified projects and to make the model available to the public; requiring the Department to use the model to rank specified projects; requiring the Department to include specified rankings and scores in an appendix to the Consolidated Transportation Program and on the Department's Web site; establishing the Workgroup on the Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Norman, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Waugh, Kasemeyer, Madaleno, Currie, DeGrange, Ferguson, Guzzone, King, Manno, McFadden, and Peters
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0402
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Environment and Transportation
Broad Subject(s):Transportation - Highways
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Bridges and Tunnels
Electronic Government -see also- Electronic Communication
Emergency Bills
Highways
Interstate Affairs
Investments -see also- Securities
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(2-103.7)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2017 11:59 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/14/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {849036/143
Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted43
3/15/20173/15/2017Favorable with Amendments {849036/1 Report Adopted44
Floor Amendment {983727/1 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted44
Floor Amendment {713728/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/16/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)45
House3/17/20173/14/2017First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation48
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {584664/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/7/20173/31/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)65
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (46-0)62
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/11/20174/11/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.