SB0310 (CH0055)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Montgomery County - Micro-Brewery Licenses and Class D Beer and Light Wine Licenses

Sponsored by:

Montgomery County Senators

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55


Synopsis:Authorizing the Comptroller to issue a Class 7 micro-brewery license in Montgomery County to a holder of a Class D beer and light wine license.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Montgomery County Senators
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0140
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs   View Committee HearingEconomic Matters
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Comptroller
Montgomery County
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:55 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/17/20141/17/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/20141/29/2014Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20143/4/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/20143/5/2014Favorable with Amendments {664732/1 Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed with Amendments39
3/7/20143/7/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)41
House3/7/20143/7/2014First Reading Economic Matters43
3/27/20143/27/2014Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/27/20143/22/2014Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
3/28/20143/23/2014Third Reading Passed (134-0)59
Senate3/31/20143/22/2014Returned Passed56
Post Passage4/8/20144/8/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:55 P.M.