SB0314

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Bay Restoration Fund - Fee Exemption, Disbursements, and Financial Assistance (Septic Stewardship Act of 2018)

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Synopsis:Exempting a user of an on-site sewage disposal system from paying the Bay Restoration Fee under certain circumstances; authorizing certain fee revenue collected for the Bay Restoration Fund to be used for financial assistance to certain homeowners for the reasonable cost of pumping out on-site sewage disposal systems; specifying that financial assistance under the Act may be provided only if the homeowner resides in a local jurisdiction that has developed a certain plan that meets certain conditions; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Mathias, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Serafini, and Simonaire
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0361
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Environment
Narrow Subject(s):Chesapeake Bay
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Jurisdiction
Refuse Disposal -see also- Recycling
Residency -see also- Immigrants and Citizenship
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Sewage
Statutes:Article - Environment
(9-1605.2)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 14, 2018 9:09 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/22/20181/22/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
1/26/20181/26/2018Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs13
1/29/20181/29/2018Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/26/20182/26/2018Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 22, 2018 4:11 P.M.