SB0317 (CH0149)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149


Synopsis:Requiring the Governor to appropriate at least $1,000,000 each fiscal year for the Partnership for Workforce Quality Program; establishing the More Jobs for Marylanders Program in the Department of Commerce to provide manufacturing business entities tax credits and benefits for up to 10 consecutive benefit years; requiring the Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning to partner with specified State departments to identify opportunities to create apprenticeship programs; allowing a tax credit for employing an apprentice; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Mathias, McFadden, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Waugh, Kasemeyer, Madaleno, Currie, DeGrange, Ferguson, Guzzone, King, Peters, Klausmeier, and Rosapepe
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0394
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017, July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Economic and Community Development
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property
Narrow Subject(s):Apprentices
Appropriations
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Enterprise Zones
Exemptions
Federal Government
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee
Governor
Higher Education Commission
Income Tax
Industry and Technology
Interstate Affairs
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Property Tax
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sunset
Tax Credits
Urban Renewal -see also- Commercial Rehabilitation
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Corporations and Associations
(1-203.1)
Article - Economic Development
(1-101, 3-402, 3-411, 6-101, 6-801 through 6-809)
Article - Education
(18-101, 18-3301 through 18-3304, 21-204)
Article - Labor and Employment
(11-102, 11-103)
Article - Tax - General
(10-210.1, 1-303, 10-741, 10-742, 11-411)
Article - Tax - Property
(9-110)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2017 1:53 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20173/24/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/24/20173/22/2017Favorable with Amendments {549137/151
Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted51
3/28/20173/24/2017Favorable with Amendments {549137/1 Budget and Taxation Report Adopted53
Floor Committee Amendment {739336/1 Adopted53
Floor Amendment {863526/1 (Senator Manno) Rejected (8-34)53
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53
3/29/20173/25/2017Third Reading Passed (45-1)54
House3/30/20173/26/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations60
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Ways and Means
4/4/20174/4/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/10/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments {795566/170
Committee Amendment Withdrawn70
Substitute Committee Amendment {685065/2 Adopted70
Second Reading Passed with Amendments70
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Walker) Adopted (133-0)70
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)70
Senate4/10/20174/4/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (46-1)64
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/11/20174/11/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.