SB0317

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Higher Education Degree and Job Certification Without Debt Act of 2018

Sponsored by:

Senator Pinsky

Status:

In the House - Conference Committee Appointed


Synopsis:Requiring the Governor to include $500,000 in fiscal year 2020 and $750,000 in each of fiscal years 2021 through 2024 in the State budget to the Higher Education Commission for near completer grants for certain recipients; requiring that grants are to be provided on a first-come, first-served basis and may be used only for tuition; establishing the Maryland Community College Promise Program to provide an opportunity for community college students to earn an associate degree or a certificate debt-free; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Pinsky, Kasemeyer, Conway, Madaleno, Astle, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0951
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means  View Committee Hearing
Appropriations
Broad Subject(s):Higher Education
Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Community Colleges
Corporations -see also- Municipal Corps; Public Corps & Inst
Governor
Grants
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Higher Education Commission
Income Tax
Loans -see also- Mortgages
Residency -see also- Immigrants and Citizenship
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Tuition
Statutes:Article - Education
(11-209, 16-317, 16-514, 16-701 through 16-707)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 26, 2018 12:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
1/26/20181/26/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {944238/145
Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted45
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments {944238/1 Report Adopted (33-13)46
Floor Amendment {183820/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-30)46
Floor Amendment {163922/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-30)46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/16/20183/16/2018Third Reading Passed (31-13)48
House3/16/20183/13/2018First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations47
3/17/20183/17/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
4/7/20184/7/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/7/20183/30/2018Favorable with Amendments {375063/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/9/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (91-44)66
Senate4/9/20184/4/2018Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments66
Senate Requests House Recede66
Conference Committee Appointed66
Senators Pinsky, Kagan, and Waugh66
House4/9/20184/4/2018House Refuses to Recede69
Conference Committee Appointed69
Delegates Luedtke, Ebersole, and Patterson69

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 11:54 P.M.