SB0348 (CH0260)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Use of Text Messaging Device or Handheld Telephone While Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death or Serious Injury - Penalties

Sponsored by:

Senator Manno

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from committing a violation of a prohibition against using a text messaging device or a handheld telephone while driving that causes an accident that directly results in the death or serious bodily injury of another; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Manno
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1212
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings   View Committee HearingJudiciary   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Narrow Subject(s):Accidents
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Death -see also- Advance Medical Directives; Wrongful Death
Drivers' Licenses
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:55 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/22/20141/22/2014First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2/7/20142/7/2014Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20143/17/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/18/20143/13/2014Favorable with Amendments {108976/147
Laid Over (Senator Getty) Adopted47
3/19/20143/14/2014Favorable with Amendments {108976/1 Report Adopted48
Floor Amendment (Senator Getty) {423227/1 Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/20/20143/15/2014Third Reading Passed (46-0)49
House3/21/20143/18/2014First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations54
3/26/20143/26/2014Rereferred to Judiciary
3/27/20143/27/2014Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20144/2/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/2/20143/26/2014Favorable with Amendments {632018/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/3/20143/27/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (117-20)63
Senate4/4/20143/26/2014Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments60
Senate Requests House Recede60
Conference Committee Appointed60
Senators Raskin, Shank, and Muse60
House4/5/20143/29/2014House Refuses to Recede65
Conference Committee Appointed65
Delegates Anderson, Clippinger, and Cluster65
Senate4/7/20143/29/2014Conference Committee Report Adopted63
Third Reading Passed (47-0)63
House4/7/20144/3/2014Conference Committee Report Adopted70
Third Reading Passed (110-23)70
Senate4/7/20143/31/2014Passed Enrolled70
Post Passage4/14/20144/14/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:55 P.M.