SB0355

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Baltimore City - Housing Authority of Baltimore City - Subsidiary Entities

Sponsored by:

Senator McFadden

Status:

Veto sustained (0-46)


Synopsis:Providing that a not-for-profit entity shall be deemed controlled by the Housing Authority of Baltimore City under specified circumstances; and altering the applicability of specified tax exemption provisions for property of a subsidiary entity of a Baltimore Housing Authority entity.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator McFadden (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0543
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingEnvironment and Transportation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Counties - Local Laws
Taxes - Property - Local
Narrow Subject(s):Baltimore City
Exemptions
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condos; Mobile & Manuf Homes
Nonprofit Organizations
Property Tax
Statutes:Article - Housing and Community Development
(12-104, 12-502)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:48 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/9/20153/9/2015Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/20153/10/2015Favorable Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed39
3/12/20153/12/2015Third Reading Passed (37-10)41
House3/13/20153/13/2015First Reading Environment and Transportation43
3/20/20153/20/2015Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20154/6/2015Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/7/20154/1/2015Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/10/20154/4/2015Third Reading Passed (112-23)65
Senate4/11/20154/4/2015Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/13/20161/13/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
1/21/20161/21/2016Veto sustained (0-46)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:48 P.M.