SB0360 (CH0044)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Aggravated Animal Cruelty - Baiting

Sponsored by:

Senator Simonaire

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from using or allowing a dog to be used for baiting; prohibiting a person from possessing, owning, selling, transporting, or training a dog with the intent to use the dog for baiting; and prohibiting a person from knowingly allowing specified premises to be used for baiting.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Simonaire, Colburn, Ferguson, Forehand, Gladden, Glassman, Jacobs, Jennings, Madaleno, Montgomery, Raskin, Reilly, Shank, Stone, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0542
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Animals -see also- Birds; Turtles
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Violence -see also- Domestic Violence; Harassment
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(10-607)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/19/20133/17/2013Favorable Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed48
3/21/20133/19/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)50
House3/21/20133/18/2013First Reading Judiciary51
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/28/20133/24/2013Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/1/20133/26/2013Third Reading Passed (133-0)59
Senate4/1/20133/27/2013Returned Passed58
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.