SB0394

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Auditing Requirements - Repeal

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Repealing specified provisions of law that relate to the appointment, salary, removal, and powers of a county auditor for St. Mary's County; and repealing specified provisions of law concerning a specified annual audit and an accounting system in the county.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Waugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0243
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Counties - Local Laws
Narrow Subject(s):Accountants
Auditors and Audits
St. Mary's County
Statutes:Article - St. Mary's County
(8-1, 8-2, 8-4)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 21, 2017 3:57 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/27/20171/27/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2/27/20172/27/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/20172/28/2017Favorable Report Adopted33
Second Reading Passed33
3/2/20173/2/2017Third Reading Passed (45-0)35
House3/3/20173/3/2017First Reading Appropriations38
3/8/20173/8/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/10/20174/3/2017Favorable Report Adopted68
Second Reading Passed68
4/10/20174/4/2017Third Reading Passed (136-0)69
Senate4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 30, 2017 1:01 P.M.