SB0395 (CH0297)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297


Synopsis:Altering the type of position of specified personnel in the St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission; establishing specified personnel positions in the Commission as contractual positions; and establishing that the Director of the Commission is the immediate supervisor of the General Counsel, Treasurer or Chief Financial Officer, Chief Engineer, and any other department director.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Waugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0679
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingEnvironment and Transportation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Counties - Local Laws
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Engineers
Public Local Laws
St. Mary's County
Treasurers
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - St. Mary's County
(113-1C.)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 26, 2017 1:55 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/27/20171/27/2017First Reading Finance
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20172/20/2017Favorable Report by Finance
Favorable Report Adopted27
Second Reading Passed27
2/22/20172/22/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)29
House2/23/20172/23/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation32
3/28/20173/28/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/7/20173/31/2017Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)66
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:12 A.M.