SB0413 (CH0049)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal History Records Checks - Informal Child Care Providers

Sponsored by:

Senator King

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49


Synopsis:Altering provisions of law relating to individuals required to obtain a criminal history records check; requiring an adult known to be residing in an informal child care provider's home to obtain a criminal history records check; requiring specified informal child care providers to obtain a criminal history records check; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators King, Benson, Colburn, Forehand, Jacobs, Kelley, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Peters, Robey, Shank, Stone, Young, and Brinkley
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0443
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1330 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Family Law
Narrow Subject(s):Child Care
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Statutes:Article - Family Law
(5-561, 5-562, 5-564)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/19/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {928671/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/21/20133/19/2013Third Reading Passed (46-1)50
House3/21/20133/18/2013First Reading Judiciary51
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20133/29/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20133/27/2013Third Reading Passed (139-0)60
Senate4/3/20133/29/2013Returned Passed60
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.