SB0415 (CH0051)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal History Records Checks - Child Care Providers

Sponsored by:

Senator King

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51


Synopsis:Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to transmit weekly a specified registry to the State Department of Education in a specified format; prohibiting a registered sex offender from entering onto specified real property on which a home is located where specified informal child care is provided or will be provided; requiring the State Department of Education to conduct specified cross-references; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators King, Benson, Colburn, Currie, Forehand, Jacobs, Kelley, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Peters, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, Shank, Stone, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0442
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Family Law
Narrow Subject(s):Child Care
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Education, State Department of
Ex-Offenders
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
Sexual Offenses
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Criminal Procedure
(11-713, 11-722)
Article - Family Law
(5-561, 5-564.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/13/20133/13/2013Favorable with Amendments {588774/1 Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/15/20133/15/2013Third Reading Passed (41-0)46
House3/18/20133/15/2013First Reading Judiciary48A
3/19/20133/19/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20133/29/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20133/27/2013Third Reading Passed (139-0)60
Senate4/3/20133/29/2013Returned Passed60
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.