SB0422 (CH0261)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining - Representation Fees

Sponsored by:

Senator Pugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261


Synopsis:Requiring public school employers in all jurisdictions of the State to negotiate with employee organizations designated as the exclusive representatives for the public school employees a requirement of a service or representation fee to be charged to nonmembers; providing a specified exception and requirement for specified noncertificated employees whose religious beliefs are opposed to joining or financially supporting a collective bargaining organization; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Pugh, Benson, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, Gladden, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Montgomery, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robey, Rosapepe, Stone, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0667
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Finance  Listen to Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Collective Bargaining
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Schools
Religion -see also- Churches
Teachers
Unions
Statutes:Article - Education
(6-407, 6-504)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Finance
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2/4/20132/4/2013Hearing cancelled
2/28/20132/28/2013Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20134/2/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {487370/159
Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 59
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable with Amendments {487370/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (34-13)61
House4/4/20133/29/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations62
4/6/20134/6/2013Rereferred to Ways and Means
4/8/20134/8/2013Hearing 4/08 at 11:30 a.m.
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/8/20134/3/2013Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
4/8/20134/4/2013Third Reading Passed (99-41)68
Senate4/8/20134/6/2013Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.