SB0429

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Higher Education - Student Loan Notification Letter

Sponsored by:

Senator Klausmeier

Status:

Veto sustained (0-44)


Synopsis:Requiring institutions of higher education that receive State funds to provide specified information to students regarding their education loans; requiring the education loan information to be provided annually; providing that specified information may include a specified statement; prohibiting an institution of higher education from incurring a specified liability, under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Klausmeier, Benson, Cassilly, Eckardt, Madaleno, Muse, Ready, Rosapepe, Salling, Smith, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0509
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Higher Education
Narrow Subject(s):Disclosure
Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Notices
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Tuition
Statutes:Article - Education
(18-115)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 12, 2018 3:29 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/27/20171/27/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2/2/20172/2/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable with Amendments {404133/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/17/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)46
House3/17/20173/14/2017First Reading Appropriations48
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/31/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments {824362/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/4/20173/28/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-6)62
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (46-0)62
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/12/20181/12/2018Veto sustained (0-44)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 12, 2018 3:29 P.M.