SB0437

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission - Review of Drug Transparency and Notification Laws and Initiatives

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations


Synopsis:Requiring the Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission to review specified prescription drug transparency and notification laws and initiatives and information for purposes of assessing proposals for the adoption and implementation of laws or other initiatives in the State; authorizing the Commission, as part of its review, to consider specified studies and to receive input from experts on prescription drug pricing; and making the Act subject to a specified contingency.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Conway, Astle, Benson, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0666
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Contingency - on enactment of another bill
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingRules and Executive Nominations
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Disclosure
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
Electronic Government -see also- Electronic Communication
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee
Governor
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Identification
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Information
Reports
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2017 8:22 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/30/20171/30/2017First Reading Finance
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/5/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {417674/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/6/20173/31/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/6/20173/30/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations64

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 6, 2017 3:12 P.M.