SB0449

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations

Sponsored by:

Senator Young

Status:

In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)


Synopsis:Altering the effective dates of specified regulations adopted under the Administrative Procedure Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Young, Mathias, and Simonaire
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0166
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs   View Committee HearingHealth and Government Operations   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Administrative Procedure Act
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Environmental Health -see also- Pollution
Federal Government
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Maryland Register
Medical Assistance
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:56 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/27/20141/27/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/20141/29/2014Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/5/20142/5/2014Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/13 at 1:45 p.m.
2/13/20142/13/2014Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/14 at 1:45 p.m.
3/10/20143/10/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/20143/8/2014Favorable with Amendments {414432/1 Report Adopted42
Second Reading Passed with Amendments42
3/13/20143/10/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)44
House3/14/20143/11/2014First Reading Health and Government Operations47
3/19/20143/19/2014Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20144/3/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/3/20143/27/2014Favorable with Amendments {136682/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/4/20143/28/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)64

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:56 P.M.