SB0464

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Higher Education - College Admissions Outreach Program for High-Achieving Students - Establishment

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Establishing the College Admissions Outreach Program for High-Achieving Students; requiring the Program to provide information on the college admissions process to eligible students free of charge, collaborate with a specified nonprofit entity to identify specified students and to make the students' contact information available to specified institutions of higher education, develop and implement a specified system to provide specified institutions of higher education with access to a specified student contact list; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Madaleno, Benson, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Middleton, Pinsky, Rosapepe, and Young
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: SB0534 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Higher Education
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Grants
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Higher Education Commission
Private Schools
Public Information
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Students
Statutes:Article - Education
(18-303.2)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20162/3/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2/29/20162/29/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/20163/1/2016Favorable Report Adopted34
Second Reading Passed34
3/3/20163/3/2016Third Reading Passed (47-0)36
House3/4/20163/4/2016First Reading Ways and Means38
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.