SB0478

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums

Sponsored by:

Senator Klausmeier

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Altering a limitation on claiming the income tax credit for eligible long-term care insurance premiums for more than 1 year with respect to the same insured individual; altering the amount of the credit from a one-time $500 credit to a maximum of $250 for taxable years beginning January 1, 2015, and January 1, 2016, and a maximum of $500 for the taxable year beginning January 1, 2017, and for each taxable year thereafter; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Klausmeier, Dyson, Jacobs, Kasemeyer, King, Madaleno, Manno, Peters, Reilly, Rosapepe, and Young
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: SB0023 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Advertising
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Income Tax
Insurance Administration
Long-Term Care -see also- Continuing Care; Nursing Homes
Public Information
Tax Credits -see also- Circuit Breaker
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:56 P.M.