SB0489 (CH0485)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)

Sponsored by:

Senator Shank

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485


Synopsis:Clarifying that a person who feloniously and intentionally kills, conspires to kill, or procures the killing of the decedent is disqualified from inheriting, taking, enjoying, receiving, or otherwise benefiting from the death, probate estate, or nonprobate property of the decedent, or from receiving a general or special power of appointment conferred by the will or trust of the decedent, or from serving as a personal representative, guardian, or trustee of a trust created by the decedent; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Shank and Getty
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1211
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Estates and Trusts
Narrow Subject(s):Banks and Trust Companies
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Estates and Trusts
Fiduciaries
Financial Institutions -see also- Banks; Credit Unions; etc.
Guardians
Homicide -see also- Manslaughter; Murder
Insurance -see also- Health Ins; MAIF; Motor Vehicle Ins
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Manslaughter
Murder
Notices
Restitution
Statutes of Limitation
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(10-919)
Article - Estates and Trusts
(11-112, 2-105)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20131/31/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2/27/20132/27/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/20/20133/18/2013Favorable Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed49
3/22/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)51
House3/22/20133/19/2013First Reading Judiciary52
3/23/20133/23/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {692516/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)63
Senate4/5/20134/1/2013Senate Concur - House Amendments63
Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
Passed Enrolled63
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.