SB0503 (CH0175)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools - Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation and Automated External Defibrillator Instruction (Breanna's Law)

Sponsored by:

Senator Pugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175


Synopsis:Requiring a public school student to complete, as part of the health or physical education curriculum, instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation that includes hands-only cardiopulmonary resuscitation and the use of an automated external defibrillator, beginning with students entering grade 9 in the 2015-2016 school year; requiring each county board of education to provide specified instruction in every public school that enrolls students in any of the grades 9 through 12, beginning in the 2015-2016 school year; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Pugh, Forehand, Gladden, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Montgomery, Stone, Zirkin, and Jennings
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1366
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs   View Committee HearingWays and Means   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Emergency Medical Services
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Health -see also- Mental Health
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Public Schools
Students
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:56 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/28/20141/28/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/20141/29/2014Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/3/20143/3/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/20143/4/2014Favorable with Amendments {274739/1 Report Adopted38
Second Reading Passed with Amendments38
3/6/20143/6/2014Third Reading Passed (44-0)40
House3/7/20143/7/2014First Reading Ways and Means43
3/14/20143/14/2014Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/1/20143/25/2014Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/3/20143/27/2014Third Reading Passed (137-0)63
Senate4/4/20143/26/2014Returned Passed60
Post Passage4/14/20144/14/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:56 P.M.