SB0508 (CH0060)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds

Sponsored by:

Senator Shank

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60


Synopsis:Authorizing and empowering the Board of County Commissioners of Washington County to borrow not more than $60,000,000 in order to finance the cost of the construction, improvement, or development of specified public facilities in Washington County and to effect that borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Shank, Edwards, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0546
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  Listen to Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Narrow Subject(s):County and Baltimore City Bonds
Public Buildings and Facilities -see also- Stadiums; St Hse
Public Works
Washington County
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20131/31/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed43
3/14/20133/14/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)45
House3/14/20133/14/2013First Reading Appropriations47
3/20/20133/20/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)63
Senate4/5/20133/31/2013Returned Passed62
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.