SB0512

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force to Study the Recruitment, Retention, and Promotion of Teachers in Maryland

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Establishing the Task Force to Study the Recruitment, Retention, and Promotion of Teachers in Maryland; providing for the membership, chair, and staff for the Task Force; providing that members of the Task Force may not receive specified compensation, but are entitled to specified reimbursement for specified expenses; requiring that on or before June 1, 2017, the Task Force report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Waugh
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: SB0935 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Higher Education
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Education, State Department of
Higher Education Commission
Reports
Sunset
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/4/20162/4/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable with Amendments {774435/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/18/20163/18/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)47
House3/21/20163/18/2016First Reading Ways and Means50
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20163/24/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.