SB0532

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Child's Access to Firearms - Penalty

Sponsored by:

Senator Ferguson

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Altering the penalty for storing or leaving a loaded firearm in a location where the person knew or should have known that an unsupervised child would gain access to the firearm.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Ferguson and Ramirez
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0655
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Guns
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Storage
Weapons -see also- Guns
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(4-104)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20131/31/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/27/20132/27/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20133/5/2013Hearing cancelled
3/18/20133/18/2013Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.