SB0580 (CH0061)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Medical Marijuana - Caregiver - Affirmative Defense

Sponsored by:

Senator Raskin

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61


Synopsis:Establishing that it is an affirmative defense to a prosecution for the possession of marijuana or the possession of specified drug paraphernalia that the marijuana or drug paraphernalia was intended for medical use by an individual with a specified debilitating medical condition for whom the defendant is a specified caregiver; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Raskin
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0180
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1809 Session: 2012 1st Special Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Drugs; Subst Abus
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Diseases -see also- AIDS; Rabies
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Health -see also- Mental Health
Notices
Patients
Trials
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(5-601, 5-619)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable with Amendments {768275/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/14/20133/14/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)45
House3/14/20133/14/2013First Reading Judiciary47
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/28/20133/24/2013Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/1/20133/26/2013Third Reading Passed (95-37)59
Senate4/1/20133/27/2013Returned Passed58
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.