SB0592 (CH0296)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Natural Resources - Shark Fins - Restriction on Possession or Distribution

Sponsored by:

Senator Frosh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from possessing, selling, offering for sale, trading, or distributing a shark fin; exempting a specified person, museum, college, or university from the prohibition against possessing a shark fin under specified circumstances; and requiring the Department of Natural Resources to adopt regulations to implement the Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Frosh, Benson, Forehand, King, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Pinsky, Raskin, Rosapepe, Stone, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1148
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0465 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee HearingEnvironmental Matters
Broad Subject(s):Hunting and Fishing
Narrow Subject(s):Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Fish and Fishing -see also- Aquaculture; Gill Nets
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Museums
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
State Universities and Colleges
Statutes:Article - Natural Resources
(4-747)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20133/27/2013Favorable with Amendments {984534/158
Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Colburn) Adopted 58
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {984534/159
Committee Amendment Adopted59
Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Mathias) Adopted (23-21) 59
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted60
Floor Amendment (Senator Colburn) {283123/1 Rejected (14-32)60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (41-6)61
House4/4/20133/29/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations62
4/5/20134/5/2013Rereferred to Environmental Matters
4/6/20134/6/2013Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
4/6/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/8/20134/3/2013Third Reading Passed (124-14)67
Senate4/8/20134/5/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.